Accounts and annual returns WHITBY IN BLOOM
Charity Number: 1157790

Charity reporting is overdue by 1024 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 293 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 January 2025 | 548 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 659 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 September 2024 | 790 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1024 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 September 2024 | 1147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 September 2024 | 1155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window