WHITBY IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance education in horticultural excellence, environmental responsibility and community participation within the Parish of Whitby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £600 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA JANE SMITH BSC HONS | Chair | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tania Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SMITH | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jonathan Harston | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE CHARLTON | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Anne SMITH BA HONS | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.48k | £10.01k | £10.02k | £8.91k | £13.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.78k | £10.02k | £11.24k | £9.13k | £9.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £490 | £532 | £412 | £600 | |
|
Income from government grants | £757 | N/A | £1.30k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 January 2025 | 548 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 September 2024 | 790 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 September 2024 | 1147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 September 2024 | 1155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT THE TOWN OF WHITBY BY PROVIDING AND ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF FLOWERS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PARKS, RESIDENTIAL, COMMUNITY, AND OPEN SPACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTING ENVIRONMENTALLY RESPONSIBLE HORTICULTURAL PRACTICES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL, NATURAL AND HERITAGE ENVIRONMENT. (3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Artefacts of Whitby
159 Church Street
Whitby
YO22 4AS
- Phone:
- 01947820682
- Email:
- amanda.wib@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window