DELAMERE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delamere Community Centre serves Delamere & Oakmere residents well and is used morning, afternoon & evenings by the community. This includes Crown Green Bowling, Bridge, Badminton, Indoor Bowls, Golden Club, Whist, Snooker, Billiards, Military Whist, Women's Institute, Keep Fit, Slimming World and other meetings and social occasions. Over 400 people use the centre of which 180+ are DCA Members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 29 January 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dean | Chair | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Angela Askwith | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Michael Gore | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY WHEELER | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HERBERT RUTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.40k | £14.10k | £13.74k | £16.99k | £20.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.54k | £8.74k | £17.14k | £18.01k | £22.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 1970
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DELAMERE AND OAKMERE BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF DELAMERE AND OAKMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lothlorien
Sandy Lane
Aston
Nantwich
CW5 8DG
- Phone:
- 07741279598
- Email:
- tricia789@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window