ROLLESTON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Maintenance and provision of 6 almshouses in Rolleston on Dove for the benefit of residents of the Parishes of Rolleston and Anslow in Staffordshire. 2. Relief of financial hardship of the residents of the Parishes of Rolleston and Anslow in Staffordshire. 3. Provision for the maintenance of the clock of St Mary's Rolleston Parish Church and the bridges over Rolleston brook.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 September 2014: CIO registration
- 12 January 2015: Funds received from 239085-1 WILLIAM ROULSTON'S ALMSHOUSE AND CHARITY
- 12 January 2015: Funds received from 239085-2 POOR'S LAND
- 12 January 2015: Funds received from 239085-3 POOR'S MONEY
- 12 January 2015: Funds received from 239085 WILLIAM ROULSTON AND OTHERS
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN SANDERSON | Chair | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sandie Jane Reader | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rose Denise Tomlinson | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nisbet Houston | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Appleby | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Whitty | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Duncan Robson | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BERYL TOON | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA GILLESPIE | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.73k | £24.06k | £24.09k | £24.53k | £24.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £56.81k | £61.19k | £66.80k | £26.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 August 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 August 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2022 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2022 | 233 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
1. THE MAINTENANCE AND PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE IN CHARITABLE NEED INCLUDING THOSE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF ROLLESTON AND ANSLOW IN STAFFORDSHIRE. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISHES OF ROLLESTON AND ANSLOW IN STAFFORDSHIRE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3. THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CLOCK OF ST MARY’S ROLLESTON PARISH CHURCH AND THE BRIDGES OVER ROLLESTON BROOK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISHES OF ROLLESTON AND ANSLOW IN STAFFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Talbot & Co
148 High Street
Burton-on-Trent
DE14 1JY
- Phone:
- 01283564716
- Email:
- charities@talbotco.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window