THE RUNNING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRC provides running & fitness-based initiatives to homeless and disadvantaged young people aged 16-24, using the great value of sport as a catalyst for proactive and productive social change. By providing them with the means to participate in healthy recreation and with access to support services to relieve their needs and assist them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
- 15 January 2021: Funds received from 1159270 HOME STRAIGHT
- TRC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Loudon McMurtrie | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Efe Odeka | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wincent Lau | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Williams | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Seymour | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.59k | £280.24k | £486.62k | £374.53k | £351.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.11k | £275.43k | £352.86k | £427.06k | £421.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £49.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 December 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 December 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE MEANS TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND ACCESS SUPPORT SERVICES TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. AT THE RUNNING CHARITY, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS PEOPLE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF HOMELESSNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 St Bride Street
Floor 4
City of London
London
EC4A 4AS
- Phone:
- 07900245076
- Email:
- info@therunningcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window