FRIENDS OF PULHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1157452
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise money to support Pulham Primary School and to provide items or activities that are not within the school budget.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £3,923
Total expenditure: £2,957

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Lyndsey Jones Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
SIMONE CATHERINE GODDARD Trustee 13 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.31k £1.17k £1.47k £1.14k £3.92k
Total expenditure £1.97k £1.51k £432 £2.23k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 April 2021 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pulham Primary School
Harleston Road
Pulham Market
DISS
IP21 4SZ
Phone:
01379676313