Financial history MANCHESTER CENTRAL FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £232.46k £354.71k £309.07k £643.45k £582.89k
Total expenditure £145.65k £249.85k £282.05k £350.34k £609.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.61k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £282.80k £209.07k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £9.44k £1.21k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £348.63k £368.14k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.58k £2.58k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.89k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £350.34k £580.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £600 £624
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £28.14k