INTERNATIONAL SUPPORT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty or need for individuals overseas, particularly for those who are suffering poverty or homelessness by the provision of grants and services with a view to improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Libya
- Morocco
- Pakistan
- Turkey
Governance
- 19 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHURSHID ALAM | Chair | 12 May 2004 |
|
|
||||
TAHIR SHER ALAM | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.57k | £19.89k | £886 | £885 | £11.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.81k | £15.98k | £12.79k | £7.39k | £8.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 02 April 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 March 2025 | 706 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/08/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR NEED FOR INDIVIDUALS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING POVERTY OR HOMELESSNESS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SERVICES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Parkside Grove
Bradford
BD9 5LL
- Phone:
- 07960853170
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window