Financial history AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CAREERS & EMPLOYMENT SUPPORT SERVICES UK

Charity number: 1158103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £252.19k £460.07k £343.92k £93.00k £133.71k
Total expenditure £175.56k £167.49k £220.31k £159.21k £163.05k
Income from government contracts £20.00k £168.80k £95.69k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £171.09k £47.46k £81.58k