BUILDING HEROES EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUILDING HEROES WAS FORMED WITH THE VISION OF PROVIDING CONSTRUCTION SKILLS, EMPLOYABILITY TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE TO YOUNG UNEMPLOYED ADULTS AND MILITARY VETERANS, WORKING SIDE BY SIDE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£696,043
Donations and legacies | £274.11k | |
Charitable activities | £421.90k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £41 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£684,352
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £684.35k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £684.35k | |
Retained for future use | £11.69k |
People

25 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Cheshire East
- Darlington
- Devon
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Leicestershire
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 October 2014: CIO registration
- BHEF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Tucker MBE | Chair | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Glover | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Byron Miller | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Ian Gibbs | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Mynott | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Glyn Evans | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rose Michelle Augoustie | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Dale | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Dodson | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Betteridge | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Noel Atkins | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE PORTER | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRADBURY | Trustee | 04 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.77k | £490.26k | £423.95k | £694.02k | £696.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.20k | £242.78k | £460.28k | £743.47k | £684.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £481.95k | £274.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £212.07k | £421.90k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £41 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £743.47k | £684.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.78k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.86k | £6.08k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £100 | £100 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £172.44k | £188.83k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £296.04k | £295.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Oct 2014 as amended on 21 May 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: 1. “For the public benefit to advance the education of (a) ex-armed forces personnel and members of their immediate families and (b) socially and/or economically disadvantaged persons aged 18 and over and (c) other persons who may wish to attend educational courses provided by the Charity for the persons set out in (a) and (b) above in Construction and Horticultural Skills in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by providing their education and preparing them for entry to any occupation, trade or profession”. 2. “To advance in life and help young people through providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals”. 3. “To promote social inclusion for the public benefit amongst people aged 18 and over who are socially excluded and by preventing ex-armed forces personnel from becoming socially excluded and relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society”. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 4. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Building Heroes
Level 2
Southpoint
Old Brighton Road
Lowfield Heath
CRAWLEY
- Phone:
- 03309126200
- Email:
- info@buildingheroes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window