Trustees BUILDING HEROES EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1158886

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Tucker MBE | Chair | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Glover | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Byron Miller | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Ian Gibbs | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Mynott | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Glyn Evans | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rose Michelle Augoustie | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Dale | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Dodson | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Betteridge | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Noel Atkins | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE PORTER | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRADBURY | Trustee | 04 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.