TELFORD CRISIS SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fundraising activities to support charitable objects. Provision of free emergency food parcels for individuals and families in crisis Development and servicing of food collection points throughout the Borough of Telford and Wrekin Collaboration with other groups and agencies via Telford Crisis Network to alleviate hardship of individuals and families in the Borough of Telford and Wrekin
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £133,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 23 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS JONES | Chair | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HENRY IRONMONGER | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fionnuala Williams | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW STEPHEN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clive Bertil Ashley Elliott | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|||||
KEITH CHARLES NORTON | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.98k | £266.39k | £248.18k | £325.89k | £448.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.86k | £157.54k | £177.18k | £325.23k | £395.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.00k | £53.00k | £109.01k | £132.41k | £133.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Sep 2014 as amended on 02 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN THE BOROUGH OF TELFORD & WREKIN AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BAYLEY HILLS
EDGMOND
NEWPORT
TF10 8JG
- Phone:
- 01952810684
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
telfordsupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window