Trustees ST PAULS CHURCH WORCESTER
Charity number: 1159042

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Ann Burnett | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Micah | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Anstey | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Porter | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDEN JOHN BURNETT | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stacey | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.