Financial history CHILD FIRST TRUST

Charity number: 1158410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £169.57k £155.49k £168.31k £188.61k £191.01k
Total expenditure £151.82k £164.60k £176.25k £182.12k £186.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A