CHILD FIRST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child First Trust is a charitable company ltd by guarantee. Our charities objects are 'the advancement of education of vulnerable children within Child First Schools by providing and assisting in the provision of non statutory activities and services'. We achieve these objects by delivering and commissioning a range of programmes including Family Support Work, Speech Therapy, Counselling etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 01 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Arrowsmith | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Smith | Trustee | 27 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Zoltan | Trustee | 27 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Shipp | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARL ANTHONY MESSER BA NPQH | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire French | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.57k | £155.49k | £168.31k | £188.61k | £191.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.82k | £164.60k | £176.25k | £182.12k | £186.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN WITHIN CHILD FIRST SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF NON STATUTORY ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Hazel Close
Thorrington
Colchester
CO7 8HJ
- Phone:
- 01206252152
- Email:
- sacha@childfirsttrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.CHILDFIRSTTRUST.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window