Northamptonshire Voluntary Community Social Enterprise Assembly Limited
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By harnessing collaboration of community based voluntary , community and social enterprise sector organisations we aim to maximise sustainable funding and investment opportunities for our members and our communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 September 2014: Standard registration
- COMMSORTIA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Wixon DL | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Hayle | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hillier | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Susan O'Leary | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Foreman | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Duff | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK VINCENT MAJOR | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02m | £2.24m | £1.12m | £326.28k | £235.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03m | £2.17m | £1.16m | £354.14k | £284.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.89m | £1.69m | £790.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.02m | £2.24m | £1.13m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.03m | £2.17m | £1.14m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £5.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £19.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUN 2014 as amended on 04 May 2021 as amended on 18 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS IN THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS, VOLUNTARY GROUPS AND CHARITIES OPERATING IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE INVOLVED WITH VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. PROVIDED THAT IN THE OBJECTS; VOLUNTARY SECTOR IS DEFINED AS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS; CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northamptonshire VCSE Assembly
Unit 2
Pavilion Court
600 Pavilion Drive
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 7SL
- Phone:
- 01604637522
- Email:
- dion.hunt@commsortia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window