ARCHBISHOP SANCROFT'S AUGMENTATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 09 February 1976: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED 26 MAY 1688 AND SCHEME OF 22 AUGUST 1975
Charitable objects
AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF EACH OF THE INCUMBENTS OF THE PARISHES OF ST. LEONARD, BALDERSTONE, ST. JAMES DARWEN, ST. BARTHOLOMEW, GREAT HARWOOD, ST. LEONARD LANGHO, ST. LEONARD SALMESBURY, ST. STEPHEN TOCKHOLES AND ST. LEONARD, WALTON-LE-DALE, ALL IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window