Trustees ST MARGARET'S CENTRE
Charity number: 1160900

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Thompson | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Gavin Wort | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hare | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jones | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Stephenson | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rowley-Conwy | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY MCCABE | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WOODS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Welsh | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.