PANNAL ASH JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE HEALTHY RECREATION AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 IN THE HARROGATE AND DISTRICT AREA THROUGH THE PLAYING OF, AND COACHING IN, ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
96 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 September 2014: Standard registration
- PANNAL ASH FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS MCVEY | Chair | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hutton | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mary Norbu | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael WIlliam Orton | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey D'Alessandro-Rixon | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIFF TROTTER | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.81k | £163.70k | £167.30k | £132.64k | £142.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.31k | £121.68k | £195.90k | £137.61k | £141.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED ON 05/08/2014 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE HEALTHY RECREATION AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 IN THE HARROGATE AND DISTRICT AREA THROUGH THE PLAYING OF, AND COACHING IN, ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pannal Ash Junior Football Club
Almsford Playing Fields
Harrogate
HG2 8EF
- Phone:
- 01423879589
- Email:
- PANNALASHFC@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window