SOUTHEND CAP DEBT ADVICE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In association with Christians Against Poverty (CAP) Bradford, the centre delivers free assistance to those in debt through volunteers drawn from local churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
190 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 13 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE EADY | Chair | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Nash | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey David Fulford | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Catherine Hellenbrand | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Melanie Venables | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert Edward Briant | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barry Higgs | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.38k | £41.05k | £32.16k | £27.69k | £40.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.27k | £31.21k | £32.09k | £34.24k | £35.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MONEY MANAGEMENT AND DEBT ADVICE; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; WITHIN THE AREA OF SOUTHEND ON SEA, INCLUDING THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND AND PARTS OF ROCHFORD AND CASTLE POINT.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE AREA OF SOUTHEND ON SEA, INCLUDING THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND AND PARTS OF ROCHFORD AND CASTLE POINT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southend CAP Debt Advice Centre
Shoeburyness and TB Baptist Church
90 Thorpedene Gardens
Shoeburyness
Essex
SS3 9JD
- Phone:
- 01702345064
- Email:
- richardleadley@capuk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window