Accounts and annual returns THE RACHEL BAKER MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1162913
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required