Financial history THE RACHEL BAKER MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1162913
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £20.87k £16.89k £13.88k £83 £0
Total expenditure £229.75k £217.86k £304.98k £175.85k £279.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A