Trustees OKS EDUCATIONAL AND BENEVOLENT TRUST
Charity Number: 1159522

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lyon Henry Bartlett | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Harry John Phipson | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Frances Steadman | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
India Rosalind Leland White-Spunner | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Alice Louise Turner | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Sarah Hinves | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Friederike Pragnell Fliedner | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.