GHANAMAN EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity endeavours to provide access to education and training for individuals in Ghana who could not otherwise afford study and will ensure that no section of the general public in Ghana is unduly excluded from benefiting. In due course, it is envisaged that the charity will promote healthcare as an ancillary objective to education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Ghana
Governance
- 16 October 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KOFI OTU ESSON | Chair | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SATI DORCAS OCRAN | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ISHMAEL EVANS YAMSON | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £0 | £2.37k | £0 | £241 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.01k | £8.48k | £9.03k | £21.81k | £1.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROVIDING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND INCLUDING AND WITHOUT LIMITATION INSOFAR AS SO DOING ADVANCES EDUCATION: 3.1.1 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN GHANA; 3.1.2 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN GHANA; 3.1.3 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN GHANA; 3.1.4 THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND PAYMENT OF FEES FOR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS OF INDIVIDUALS IN GHANA; AND 3.1.5 THE PROMOTION OF A BETTER UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES TO EDUCATION FACING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN GHANA; 3.2 THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND INCLUDING AND WITHOUT LIMITATION INSOFAR AS SO DOING PROMOTES AND PROTECTS GOOD HEALTH: 3.2.1 THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT OR THE SERVICES OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN GHANA; AND 3.2.2 THE PROMOTION OF A BETTER UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES TO HEALTH AND WELFARE FACING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN GHANA. 3.3 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS, REFERENCES TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING SHALL INCLUDE, IN ADDITION TO THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS, TEACHER TRAINING AND COMMUNITY ADULT EDUCATION PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 44
Aura House
39 Melliss Avenue
Richmond
TW9 4BX
- Phone:
- +233208192000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window