Trustees LONDON WELSH RUGBY CLUB CHOIR
Charity number: 1160723

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MARTYN JONES BA | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
William Barry Jones | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Davies MA Cantab | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Robert Taylor BSc MSc | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD PLANCHE ACMA | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER BOYLE B.SC. | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP KEVIN HUGHES M.SC, B.SC | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAVID MCGRATH BA | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.