Financial history CRIBBS SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1160368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £152.72k £89.32k £55.77k £55.52k £101.61k
Total expenditure £109.02k £77.52k £88.21k £88.19k £119.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £28.50k N/A N/A N/A