THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD GARDEN OF FRUITFULNESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Worship, Community Outreach, Evangelism, Christian conferences
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 10 September 2014: Standard registration
- RCCG GARDEN OF FRUITFULNESS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benson Ossai | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Adebunmi Alabi | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SANYA | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.28k | £39.01k | £38.23k | £50.41k | £60.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.12k | £27.59k | £37.90k | £43.15k | £63.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/06/2014
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Windermere Avenue
PURFLEET-ON-THAMES
Essex
RM19 1PZ
- Phone:
- 07984532214
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window