I AM SOMEBODY'S CHILD SOLDIER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Providing food and clothes to child soldiers and victims of war in Northern Uganda. 2. Providing an on- going psychotherapy service to victims of war through a rehabilitation centre built to annex Laroo Boarding School in Northern Uganda. 3. Enhancing public awareness of the impact of mental illness on the lives of child soldiers and child victims of war in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 July 2014: CIO registration
- IAMSCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirah Zirabamuzale Mansaray LLB LAW | Chair | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Esterhuizen | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nanette Onu | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Teixeira | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MANSARAY BA-JUSTICE | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £3.94k | £11.07k | £19.88k | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £3.71k | £10.69k | £20.23k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 JUL 2014 AMENDED ON 06 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ON-GOING PSYCHOTHERAPY FOR RESCUED CHILD SOLDIERS STILL SUFFERING FROM POST-WAR TRAUMA IN NORTHERN UGANDA AND BUILDING A REHABILITATION CENTRE FOR THE CONTINUED PROVISION OF ON-GOING PSYCHOTHERAPY TO RESCUED CHILD SOLDIERS AND VICTIMS OF WAR. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE IMPACT OF MENTAL ILLNESS IN AFRICA. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF FORMER CHILD SOLDIERS, VICTIMS OF WAR, WOMEN RETURNEES AND CHILDREN BORN IN CAPTIVITY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 4.-TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF FORMER CHILD SOLDIERS, VICTIMS OF WAR, WOMEN RETURNEES AND CHILDREN BORN IN CAPTIVITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 WEST WORLD
WEST GATE
LONDON
W5 1DT
- Phone:
- 07702850480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window