WRINGTON REDHILL FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 17 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN GEORGE PORTER | Chair | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Bull | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Clements | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Taplin | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Holland | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID CLEMENTS | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BUSH | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
SHANE WILLIAM LOVATT | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL JOAN PORTER | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS FINCH | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WILLIAM BULL | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.00k | £8.20k | £22.98k | £21.26k | £18.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.97k | £6.67k | £20.39k | £22.23k | £22.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WRINGTON REDHILL AND NORTH SOMERSET BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Becket Road
Weston-super-Mare
BS22 7TY
- Phone:
- 01934515686
- Email:
- sgporter_uk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window