Accounts and annual returns ELYSIUM@GS CIO
Charity number: 1159341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 13 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | 13 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 26 April 2016 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | 26 April 2016 | 26 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window