ELYSIUM@GS CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHANGING PLACES STATION ACTIVITY SESSIONS INCLUDING; SINGING FOR A SMILE; FRIENDSHIP GROUPS; GAMES CLUBS; INDEPENDENT LIVING SESSIONS INCLUDING HEALTHY EATING; KNIT AND KNITTER; EXERCISE CLASSES; ESOL CLASSES AND MANY MORE TARGET AUDIENCE; CHILDREN / ADULTS/ ELDERLY OF ALL ABILITIES/ DISABILITIES PARTIES HELD IN LARGE HALL MEETING ROOMS FOR HIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.28k | £32.27k | £24.92k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.37k | £33.98k | £22.32k | £7.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.94k | £4.47k | £20.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 01 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 28 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 13 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | 13 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 26 April 2016 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | 26 April 2016 | 26 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREAT HARWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT HARWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window