Financial history SOUTH CHARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1158883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £71.94k £62.36k £55.34k £88.39k £54.74k
Total expenditure £66.00k £63.88k £54.77k £60.12k £68.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.45k N/A