THE MAGIC OF LIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust oversees the running of The Magic Life Butterfly House in Aberystwyth. The Butterfly House is an educational centre open to the public from Easter through to the end of October. Educational tours and talks are given throughout the day focussing on biodiversity and rain forests. A key aim is to spark an interest in nature. The Trust also owns a collection of over 800 rare plants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 13 January 2015: CIO registration
- THE MAGIC OF LIFE BUTTERFLY HOUSE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER JENKINS | Chair | 01 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Richards | Trustee | 23 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SACHA BUSH | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY ALLMAN BA BOTANY | Trustee | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.20k | £85.20k | £136.02k | £169.45k | £217.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.05k | £79.88k | £104.01k | £136.34k | £160.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.85k | £16.12k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING THE NATURAL WORLD FOR THE MUTUAL BENEFIT OF BOTH PEOPLE AND NATURE 3) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN BREEDING PROGRAMS?OF RARE SPECIES OF PLANTS AND ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Magic of Life Butterfly House
Cwmrheidol
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 3NB
- Phone:
- 01970 880928
- Email:
- info@magicoflife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window