Accounts and annual returns ELLEN GREENOE (BOLD) CHARITY

Charity number: 504934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required