CHILTERN MUSIC ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An independent music academy based in High Wycombe, providing musical activities for children aged 4-19, including the provision of orchestras, choirs, bands, jazz and chamber ensembles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUEL DENNIS LAUGHTON | Chair | 06 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Julia Bentley-Dawkes | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Smart | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amir Jafri | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Connolly | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
HILARY NOHAVICKA | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alex Elizabeth King | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE-MARIE SOUTHALL | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.61k | £171.48k | £92.08k | £175.35k | £264.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.41k | £145.73k | £62.47k | £144.13k | £220.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Aug 2014 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF ORCHESTRAS, CHOIRS AND OTHER ENSEMBLES SO THAT THEY CAN REHEARSE AND PERFORM TO THE PUBLIC; AND TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS OR IN WHATEVER OTHER WAYS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Royal Grammar School
Amersham Road
High Wycombe
Buckinghamshire
HP13 6QT
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window