BUNGAY TOWN TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1159281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes with surplus income donated to local groups & organisations & the administration of 13 Almshouses for the elderly & in need residents of Bungay and the surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £242,870
Total expenditure: £60,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 2014: CIO registration
  • 05 September 2017: Funds received from 243568 BUNGAY TOWN TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BUNGAY TOWN TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eamon Patrick Gaffney Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Catherine Jane Fuller Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Jacqueline Bell Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Roger Yaxley Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Jason Alexander Collins Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Frances Charlotte Betts Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Alan John Pearmain Trustee 17 August 2023
None on record
Emma Suzanne Beese Trustee 26 October 2021
BUNGAY MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST/ SCOTT CHARITY
Received: On time
BUNGAY MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (CIO)
Recently registered
Mary Joan Seamons Trustee 28 April 2020
None on record
John Arnold Adams Trustee 30 March 2020
BUNGAY MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Jane Vass Trustee 05 November 2019
CHARITIES OF ELIZA DREYER FOR HOMES FOR POOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
FALCON MEADOW COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
PETER DUNCAN SCOTT Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
STEPHEN HONEYWOOD Trustee 01 January 2018
BUNGAY MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (CIO)
Recently registered
CHRIS REEVE Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
MAUREEN DAVIES Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
STEPHEN GLENN WENT Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
RICHARD HARRY CUNDY Trustee 01 January 2016
BUNGAY CASTLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: 3 days late
JOHN WARNES Trustee 01 November 2015
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, BUNGAY
Received: On time
KEVIN HOWELL Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
PETER MORROW Trustee 31 March 2015
None on record
TERRY REEVE Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record
GRAHAM JOHN MAY Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
CHRIS HAND Trustee 01 July 2014
BUNGAY MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (CIO)
Recently registered
BUNGAY MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST/ SCOTT CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY SPRAKE Trustee 01 May 2014
DITCHINGHAM MEN'S SHED
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
KEITH WILLIAM PARKER Trustee 08 April 2014
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, BUNGAY
Received: On time
COLIN ROY HANCY Trustee 01 January 2014
BUNGAY CASTLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: 3 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £104.18k £102.90k £88.66k £92.76k £242.87k
Total expenditure £69.76k £54.56k £42.47k £62.35k £60.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Sprake & Kingsley
16 Broad Street
BUNGAY
Suffolk
NR35 1EN
Phone:
01986893133
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available