Financial history SOUTHAMPTON ATHLETIC CLUB CIO

Charity Number: 1158398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £69.21k £37.42k £87.92k £64.57k £68.70k
Total expenditure £60.56k £23.91k £43.58k £58.37k £62.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.49k N/A