SOUTHAMPTON ATHLETIC CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity include track and field athletics, cross country running, road running and triathlon. The club organises and provides coaching, training and competitive teams (where appropriate) for these activities. These activities are provided to all age groups from children to veterans. The club is also committed to improving the facilities for athletics in the Southampton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 29 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Helen Jones | Chair | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Callaway | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek William Warn | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Reavey | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MCKENZIE PEARSON | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.21k | £37.42k | £87.92k | £64.57k | £68.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.56k | £23.91k | £43.58k | £58.37k | £62.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.49k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND ATHLETIC RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Moorgreen Road
West End
SOUTHAMPTON
SO30 3EB
- Phone:
- 07717501265
- Email:
- TREASURER4SAC@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window