HANBURY COUNTRYSIDE SHOW SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to promote and encourage ,horticulture, conservation and forestry for the public benefit and to improve and advance them in all branches and in all trades,crafts and professions with them in an exclusively charitable manner. Educational advancement in all the above by granting of bursaries. Promotion of the above to the public by holding of an annual show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £2,050 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
315 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 January 2015: Standard registration
- HCSSL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Steenton | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOSEPH HEATH | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN WOFFORD | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.47k | £17.31k | £117.33k | £151.43k | £176.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.17k | £23.77k | £78.92k | £165.83k | £173.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | £14.54k | £2.67k | £2.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/01/2015
Charitable objects
4.1 TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, CONSERVATION, FORESTRY AND INDUSTRY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COUNTIES OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND WARWICKSHIRE) AND TO IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THEM IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES AND IN ALL TRADES, CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS WITH THEM IN AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MANNER, AND 4.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN CONNECTION WITH AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, CONSERVATION, FORESTRY AND RURAL AND TRADITIONAL CRAFTS AND ACTIVITIES. 4.3 'TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND RURAL CRAFTS AND SKILLS IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES BY THE HOLDING OF AN ANNUAL SHOW.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COUNTIES OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Hall Farm
Hollowfields Road
Hanbury
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B96 6RD
- Phone:
- 07841499660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window