Financial history DEFIBRILLATORS FOR ALL

Charity number: 1159261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £19.90k £27.40k £30.59k £22.56k £19.82k
Total expenditure £13.04k £11.68k £47.73k £14.64k £9.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A