THE MALPAS ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 504944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides housing accommodation for beneficiaries who are single men or women aged sixty years or over residing in Malpas or surrounding area for a period of two years or more.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £28,788
Total expenditure: £14,533

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WIGFIELD'S ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guy Myddelton Chair 09 July 2020
None on record
Hugh Wynne Ockleston Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Jennifer Margaret Humes Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
EMMA HERMIONE HIGGIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.85k £23.07k £21.51k £25.11k £28.79k
Total expenditure £9.63k £10.04k £45.72k £15.91k £14.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Depenbech Close
MALPAS
SY14 8QS
Phone:
07929293704
Website:

No information available