CANSUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to support the running costs of the Delamere Cancer Support & Information Centre, Halton Hospital. This provides services to cancer patients, their families & friends in the Halton and Warrington areas, including complementary therapies, refreshments, counselling, wig fitting, a cancer rehab course and a course on wig/scalp care & make-up.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- St Helens
- Warrington
Governance
- 18 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MELVYN DOWNING | Chair | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.18k | £13.17k | £17.48k | £20.51k | £20.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.92k | £5.80k | £11.45k | £27.22k | £18.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS OF THOSE USING THE OUTPATIENTS’ CENTRE SITUATED AT THE DELAMERE CENTRE IN HALTON HOSPITAL, RUNCORN, CHESHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE RUNNING OF THE CENTRE AND SUPPLYING SUCH ITEMS AND EQUIPMENT TO COMPLEMENT THE SERVICES AND SUPPORT OFFERED TO PATIENTS AS SHALL BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
237 MANCHESTER ROAD
WARRINGTON
WA1 3RQ
- Phone:
- 01925837324
- Email:
- iandowning5@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window