SUITS FOR TROOPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of suits for injured service personnel looking to get civilian work and associated activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 23 September 2017 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | 23 September 2017 | 23 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 17 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 17 August 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED AMONG FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES, WHO AS A RESULT OF THEIR MILITARY SERVICE, HAVE BEEN INJURED OR DISABLED OR SUFFER FROM ILL HEALTH (WHETHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) ("EX-SERVICEMEN"), BY: 1 PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE OF THE DIFFICULTIES FACED BY EX-SERVICEMEN IN SEEKING RE-EMPLOYMENT FOLLOWING THEIR SERVICE TO THE ARMED FORCES AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CAPABILITIES OF EX-SERVICEMEN DESPITE THEIR INJURIES; 2 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO EX-SERVICEMEN TO ASSIST THEM IN DEVELOPING CERTAIN SKILLS REQUIRED TO OBTAIN AND RETAIN WORK OUTSIDE THE ARMED FORCES; AND 3 PROVIDING SUPPORT TO EX-SERVICEMEN DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO BE PROMOTED AS SKILLED CANDIDATES THAT ARE READY TO WORK, IN PARTICULAR, BY PROVIDING SUITABLE BUSINESS ATTIRE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE SELF-ESTEEM AND CONFIDENCE OF EX-SERVICEMEN DURING INTERVIEWS AND EMPLOYMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window