BRITISH GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current activities include: gymnastics exercise programme which is both dementia-friendly and age-friendly; hardship grants programme; sports leadership programme for parents interested in a career in sport and living in a deprived area, combined with a pre-school gymnastics course for their children; Gym Challenge in special school; gym day for Chernobyl children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £86,721 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Colin Laybourne | Chair | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Jane Ashman | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Tolometti | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chisara Nwabara | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Cook | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David James Marshall | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Fawcett | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.40k | £392.03k | £311.77k | £372.70k | £293.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.87k | £336.67k | £422.30k | £444.50k | £377.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £146.97k | £162.51k | N/A | £143.28k | £86.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAY 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 SEP 2022 as amended on 13 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are for the public benefit: 2.1 to promote community participation in health recreation by providing facilities for participating in gymnastics and other sports ("facilities" means land, buildings, equipment and organising sporting events); 2.2 to provide and assist in providing facilities for sport, recreation or other leisure time occupation of such persons who have need for such facilities by reason of their youth, age, poverty or social or economic circumstance or for disabled people and the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life; 2.3 to advance the education of children and young people; and 2.4 to advance any other purpose that is charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales in association with sport.
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Gymnastics
Lilleshall National Sports Centre
Lilleshall
Newport
TF10 9AT
- Phone:
- 08451297129
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window