BRIDGEND TOWN JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridgend Town Football Club engages young people to take an active part in grassroots football. We provide weekly training facilities for teams aged from Under 6 to Senior level. We enable our players to take part in a local football league with opportunities to express themselves, learn and develop essential social skills and a healthy lifestyle within a positive and safe sporting environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,710 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 17 September 2014: CIO registration
- BTJFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Cheverton | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Wilson | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Smith | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edwards | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gardner | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.65k | £3.03k | £18.26k | £29.06k | £48.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £9.42k | £19.66k | £32.11k | £46.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £7.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE HEALTHY RECREATION AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 IN BRIDGEND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PLAYING OF, AND COACHING IN, ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aevitas Wealth Ltd
5-7 Court Road
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 1BE
- Phone:
- 07590275002
- Email:
- treasurer.btjfc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window