YORK BLIND & PARTIALLY SIGHTED SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of York Blind & Partially Sighted Society (MySight York) is to advocate and provide services to enable people who are blind or partially sighted achieve independence and live well with sight loss. We provide an Equipment and Information Centre, a Befriending Service, an Eye Clinic service, activities, Employment Service and outreach to anyone struggling with sight loss in the York area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
69 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 July 1979: Standard registration
- MYSIGHT YORK (Working name)
- YBPSS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Sole | Chair | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Bethan O'Leary | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Willcox | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Iain Mitchell | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrea Glover | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Clifford | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Major David Michael Crouch | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Annette Gamston | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.32k | £561.41k | £287.70k | £285.31k | £357.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £404.50k | £371.84k | £326.25k | £385.08k | £357.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £394.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £4.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £16.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £697 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £144.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £251.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £354.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £17.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR VISUALLY IMPAIRED WHO ARE PRIMARILY RESIDENT WITHIN THE CITY OF YORK BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Linked charities
- 05 July 1979 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
My Sight York
Ground Floor
84-86 Walmgate
York
YO1 9TL
- Phone:
- 01904636269
- Email:
- hello@mysightyork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window