ORPHEUS SINFONIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orpheus Sinfonia is dedicated to helping talented young musicians develop their professional careers. We are formed of recent music conservatoire graduates and provide the experience and support necessary to help them progress in to the profession. We provide performance opportunities, a challenging repertoire and offer experience of working alongside established members of the profession.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 April 2015: Standard registration
- 02 February 2017: Funds received from 1126059 THE ORPHEUS FOUNDATION TRUST
- ORPHEUS SINFONIA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara De Biasi | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Parkin | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Browning | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie McAlpine | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Malcolm Singer | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Russell Jacobs | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
David Shaw OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.77k | £116.29k | £168.80k | £233.41k | £167.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.96k | £106.44k | £147.82k | £228.21k | £157.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.96k | £100.43k | £58.61k | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/04/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE DIRECTORS SEE FIT, INCLUDING THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
442 Linen Hall
162-168 Regent Street
London
W1B 5TE
- Phone:
- 02077346650
- Email:
- info@orpheusfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window