PAGANAID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to support sustainable development projects in poor countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- India
- Nepal
- Puerto Rico
Governance
- 31 July 2014: CIO registration
- PAGAN AID (Working name)
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Arthur Watt | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca North | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Costadina Katsaitis | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Claire Pitchford | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sif Athena Nicole Laura Brookes | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brewin | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Joan Dymond-White | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £3.86k | £2.87k | £2.60k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £905 | £1.35k | £2.72k | £2.71k | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. NOTE THAT “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.” NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apex House
Thomas Street
Trethomas
Caerphilly
CF83 8DP
- Phone:
- 01622804480
- Email:
- info@paganaid.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window