Financial history ASHOK TREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.93k £26.87k £23.76k £6.76k £8.94k
Total expenditure £24.19k £15.14k £18.26k £22.08k £13.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A