Financial history ST BENEDICT'S OAKLEY VALE

Charity number: 1157794
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2016 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020
Total gross income £12.45k £3.35k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.70k £8.10k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £0 N/A N/A N/A